open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:20-bk-12215
    Party Name:Egal Ziv
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Telephonic 341 Meeting Information]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Menninger, Henry E [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?800801
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =