open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:20-bk-31889
    Party Name:Ronald R Moore, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Reaffirmation Agreement Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Telephonic 341 Meeting Information]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Renneker, Erin C. [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?800800
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =