open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:20-32485-jpg
    Party Name:Melissa A. Larry and Tommy L. Larry
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Notice of telephonic or remote 341 meeting with instructions (Batch)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:October 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Notice Requiring Corrective Document]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baumgartner-Novak, Patti [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1082226
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =