open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

OHIO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:20-14655-aih
    Party Name:Jeffrey A. Trevena and Joygena R. Trevena
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [Notice of Order on Motion to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [ADI List of Creditors Uploaded]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:October 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stein, Sheldon [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1082228
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =