U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 07, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • September 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.