U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Reassignement/Recusal]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 01, 2022: [Indictment]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.