U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kendrick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Status Conference ]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.