U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castellanos et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 25, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Show Cause Hearing ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Pretrial Detention]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • January 09, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 09, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 09, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Omnibus Hearing ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 15, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 06, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 06, 2022: [Brady Materials]
  • September 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Brady Materials]
  • September 01, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Non-Compliance of Local Rule 5.1(c) (Clerk's Notice)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Brady Materials]
  • August 31, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 29, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • August 29, 2022: [Brady Materials]
  • August 29, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 29, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 27, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.