U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00182-DAR-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • August 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • August 25, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.