U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00630-JZ-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Noel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 06, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.