U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00775-PAB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [In Limine ]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.