U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00397-CEF-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment ]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 25, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.