U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00492-BYP-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Black
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay ]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
  • October 12, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.