U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00502-BYP-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Saris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Designate Case Complex]
  • November 17, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [SEALED MOTION]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • October 03, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order of Recusal/Reassignment]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.