U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.