U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00503-SL-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Guicho et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.