U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 12, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 12, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • September 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.