U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 16, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 30, 2022: [Statement of Facts]
  • August 30, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.