U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00498-BMB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - 821 Amendment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Compassionate Release re First Step Act of 2018 ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 07, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • April 04, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 04, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay ]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 24, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Reconsideration ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Appoint Expert ]
  • January 06, 2023: [CJA 21 - Authorization to Pay ]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay ]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [CJA 21 - Appointment ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • October 19, 2022: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Prepare Transcript]
  • October 18, 2022: [Appoint Expert ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 27, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 27, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 27, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
  • September 22, 2022: [Joinder ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 01, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 01, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • August 31, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • August 31, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 30, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • August 30, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.