U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00028-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Valerio, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Elements of the Offense]
  • January 05, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 05, 2023: [Statement of Facts]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 07, 2022: [Statement of Facts]
  • December 07, 2022: [Elements of the Offense]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Status Conference ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.