U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • September 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • August 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 31, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • August 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • August 31, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.