U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00493-SL-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Correll, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.