U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00499-DAP-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Logan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 01, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 01, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.