U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00050-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Cristian Osvaldo Elgueta-Alvarez, et al.,
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 22, 2022: [Travel]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 01, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.