U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00506-BYP-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Austin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 02, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.