U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00102-SO-2
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ajaltouni et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.