U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00459-BMB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 10, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Bond ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.