U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitehead
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.