U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00494-BYP-4
  • Case Name: USA v. May, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 14, 2025: [Continue ]
  • May 13, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 15, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 15, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 07, 2025: [SEALED MOTION]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Order]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: [Amended Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Travel ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Travel ]
  • November 03, 2022: [CJA 21 - Authorization to Pay ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 12, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 11, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 08, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 07, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.