U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00511-JJH-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barber, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • May 12, 2025: [Acquittal ]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • April 09, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 22, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2025
  • January 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [JERS Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • January 04, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 22, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2022: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • November 04, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 26, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 14, 2022: [Bond ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Bond ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 12, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Bond ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 08, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 08, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Seal Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed) ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.