U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Related Case Memorandum]
  • October 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Waiver of Right to Appear in Person]
  • October 05, 2022: [Consent to Plead Guilty Before U.S. Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.