U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Misseldine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 28, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Plead Guilty Before U.S. Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2022: [Waiver of Right to Appear in Person]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • September 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.