U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velazquez-Macias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [In Chambers Conference]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 09, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.