U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harvey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 19, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
  • September 22, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2022: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 12, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.