U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00546-DAP-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Wells
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 16, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.