U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00547-JZ-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Compassionate Release re First Step Act of 2018 ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.