U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00538-SL-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 19, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.