U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00542-DCN-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Barnes, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Travel ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Travel ]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Designate Case Complex]
  • October 19, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
  • October 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • September 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 21, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 20, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.