U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00526-DAR-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stout
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.