U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00548-JPC-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Dunn, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • October 28, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 26, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 13, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 21, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.