U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00452-SL-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.