U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lenhoff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • January 20, 2023: [Bond]
  • January 09, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.