U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
  • September 27, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 27, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2022: [Bond]
  • September 22, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.