U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00454-CAB-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Ady et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • September 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 22, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.