U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wallace
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 28, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.