U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huffman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2022: [Statement of Facts]
  • December 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Scheduling Conference ]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
  • September 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.