U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ewing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 03, 2023: [Suppress ]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • September 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 27, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 27, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • September 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.