U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00570-JPC-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Archer et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
  • April 07, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.