U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00555-BMB-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Onusic
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.