U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00568-PAB-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Clancy, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.